ORIGENE v. WOODLAND PARK BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Plaintiff: FRITZNER ORIGENE
Defendant: WOODLAND PARK BOARD OF EDUCATION and JOHN/JANE DOES A THROUGH D
Case Number: 2:2019cv12557
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/9/2019 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/11/2019. (seb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by YELENA YUKHVID on behalf of WOODLAND PARK BOARD OF EDUCATION (YUKHVID, YELENA)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by WOODLAND PARK BOARD OF EDUCATION.(BAYER, ANDREW)
June 5, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WOODLAND PARK BOARD OF EDUCATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/24/2019. (ld, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Woodland Park Board of Education. Attorney ANDREW BAYER for WOODLAND PARK BOARD OF EDUCATION added. (BAYER, ANDREW)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FRITZNER ORIGENE. WOODLAND PARK BOARD OF EDUCATION served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (HERBERT, JOHN)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to WOODLAND PARK BOARD OF EDUCATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
May 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN/JANE DOES A THROUGH D, WOODLAND PARK BOARD OF EDUCATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9668382) with JURY DEMAND, filed by FRITZNER ORIGENE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HERBERT, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ORIGENE v. WOODLAND PARK BOARD OF EDUCATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOODLAND PARK BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: ANDREW BAYER
Represented By: YELENA YUKHVID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES A THROUGH D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRITZNER ORIGENE
Represented By: JOHN TRAVIS HERBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?