GERBER et al v. A&L PLASTICS CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: ELAINE WILLIAMS and RICHARD GERBER
Defendant: MICHAEL O'SHEA, JR., AMERICAN RING & TOOL CO., SCHNEIDER & MARQUARD, INC., MICHELE SHEAFFER, SCHNEIDER & MARGUARD, INC., A&L PLASTICS CORP., AMERICAN RING, CHRISTINE LAMPARELLI, LISA SWENCAK, TAPERED TOOL & DIE, LLC., AMERICAN RING & TOOL COMPANY, A&L PLASTICS CORPORATION, AMERICAN RING AND TOOL COMPANY, SCHNEIDER, MICHAEL J. O'SHEA, II, JOHN DOES 1-10, TAPERED TOOL & DIE, LLC, A and ABC CORPS. 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv12717
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from Jonathan Meyers, Esq.. (MEYERS, JONATHAN)
July 16, 2019 Filing 18 Certification of Clerk of Court on behalf of ELAINE WILLIAMS, RICHARD GERBER. (MEYERS, JONATHAN)
July 1, 2019 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to A&L PLASTICS CORPORATION A/K/A A&LPLASTICS CORP., SCHNEIDER & MARQUARD, INC. A/K/A SCHNEIDER & MARGUARD, INC., AND MICHAEL O'SHEA, JR. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (ld, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 Request for Default by ELAINE WILLIAMS, RICHARD GERBER against A&L Plastics Corporation a/k/a A&L Plastics Corp.; Schneider & Marquard, Inc. a/k/a Schneider & Marguard, Inc.; and Michael OShea, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration supporting request to enter default, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service)(MEYERS, JONATHAN)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ELAINE WILLIAMS, RICHARD GERBER. (MEYERS, JONATHAN)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL P. AGATINO on behalf of ELAINE WILLIAMS, RICHARD GERBER (AGATINO, DANIEL)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER; that Defendant AMERICAN RING AND TOOL COMPANY ("ARTC") be permitted to answer, move, or otherwise reply with respect to the Complaint no later than July 29, 2019,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/10/2019. (ld, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, First Amended Complaint, Notice of Removal to Fed Court w Exhs., Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Removal to State Court, Original Complaint, CIS served on SCHNEIDER & MARQUARD, INC. A/K/A SCHNEIDER & MARGUARD, INC. on 6/4/2019, filed by ELAINE WILLIAMS, RICHARD GERBER. (MEYERS, JONATHAN)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, First Amended Complaint, Notice of Removal to Fed Ct. w Exhs., civil cover sheet, Notice of Removal to State Court, Complaint, CIS served on A&L PLASTICS CORPORATION A/K/A A&L PLASTICS CORP. on 6/4/2019, filed by ELAINE WILLIAMS, RICHARD GERBER. (MEYERS, JONATHAN)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to American Ring and Tool Company and Tapered Tool & Die, LLC.. (HANAN, MICHAEL)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, First Amended Complaint, Notice of Removal to Fed Ct. w Exhs., civil cover sheet, Notice of Removal to State Court, Complaint, CIS served on Michael O'Shea, Jr. on June 4, 2019, filed by ELAINE WILLIAMS, RICHARD GERBER. (MEYERS, JONATHAN)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ELAINE WILLIAMS, RICHARD GERBER. (MEYERS, JONATHAN)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to A&L PLASTICS CORPORATION, CHRISTINE LAMPARELLI, MICHAEL J. O'SHEA, II, SCHNEIDER & MARQUARD, INC., MICHELE SHEAFFER, LISA SWENCAK, TAPERED TOOL & DIE, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Summons to be Issued by ELAINE WILLIAMS, RICHARD GERBER as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 completed but unsigned summons for clerk to use in issuing summons, #2 completed but unsigned summons for clerk to use in issuing summons, #3 completed but unsigned summons for clerk to use in issuing summons, #4 completed but unsigned summons for clerk to use in issuing summons, #5 completed but unsigned summons for clerk to use in issuing summons, #6 completed but unsigned summons for clerk to use in issuing summons)(MEYERS, JONATHAN)
May 23, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMERICAN RING AND TOOL COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/10/2019. (ld, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to American Ring and Tool.. (HANAN, MICHAEL)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Summons completed but unsigned summons for clerk to use in issuing summons)(MEYERS, JONATHAN)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TAPERED TOOL & DIE, LLC. (HANAN, MICHAEL)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN RING AND TOOL COMPANY. (HANAN, MICHAEL)
May 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
May 21, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Order on complaint, alias, etc. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN MEYERS on behalf of ELAINE WILLIAMS, RICHARD GERBER (MEYERS, JONATHAN)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMERICAN RING AND TOOL COMPANY, AMERICAN RING & TOOL COMPANY, TAPERED TOOL & DIE, LLC., AMERICAN RING & TOOL CO., AMERICAN RING from Superior Court of New Jersey, Sussex County, case number SSX-L-148-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9679825), filed by AMERICAN RING AND TOOL COMPANY, AMERICAN RING & TOOL COMPANY, TAPERED TOOL & DIE, LLC., AMERICAN RING & TOOL CO., AMERICAN RING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(HANAN, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GERBER et al v. A&L PLASTICS CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL O'SHEA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN RING & TOOL CO.
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HANAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER & MARQUARD, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELE SHEAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER & MARGUARD, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&L PLASTICS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN RING
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HANAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE LAMPARELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA SWENCAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAPERED TOOL & DIE, LLC.
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HANAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN RING & TOOL COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HANAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&L PLASTICS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN RING AND TOOL COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HANAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J. O'SHEA, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAPERED TOOL & DIE, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HANAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELAINE WILLIAMS
Represented By: DANIEL P. AGATINO
Represented By: JONATHAN MEYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD GERBER
Represented By: DANIEL P. AGATINO
Represented By: JONATHAN MEYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?