THE SIENA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. et al v. OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: HEROD REDEVELOPMENT I, LLC, CHUBB INSURANCE COMPANY, J.H. MACK, LLC, THE PINNACLE COMPANIES, LLC, THE SIENA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC., PINNACLE INVESTMENT VENTURES, LLC, JONATHAN LITT, KOHL PARTNERS, LLC, HEROD MEZZ, LLC and BRIAN M. STOLAR
Defendant: NATIONAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY and MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv12817
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The Court denies the adjournment request. The July 30 Rule 16 conference will go forward as scheduled.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/15/19. (tjg, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Todd Jason Leon, requesting adjournment of Rule 16 Conference re 11 Order,,. (LEON, TODD)
June 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Remand . Responses due by 7/22/2019 Motion set for 8/5/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. COURT INDICATED MOTION SHALL BE DECIDED PURSUANT TO RULE 78. NO APPEARANCE REQUIRED. (tt, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #10 MOTION to Remand . (SCHILDT, STEVEN)
June 24, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 7/30/19 at 10am. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/24/19. (tjg, )
June 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Certification of Counsel in Support of Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(LEON, TODD)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY MARIE ZAVALAS on behalf of NATIONAL INDEMNITY COMPANY (ZAVALAS, STACEY)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SCHILDT, STEVEN)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against NATIONAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY by MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Liberty Mutual Group as Corporate Parent.. (COYNE, JOHN)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(COYNE, JOHN)
May 28, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/12/2019. (ld, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Merchants Mutual Ins. Co... (MERCOGLIANO, GAETANO)
May 23, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL INDEMNITY COMPANY identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SCHILDT, STEVEN).
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NATIONAL INDEMNITY COMPANY from Essex County Superior Court of New Jersey, case number ESX-L-2854-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9686653), filed by National Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(SCHILDT, STEVEN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE SIENA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. et al v. OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEROD REDEVELOPMENT I, LLC
Represented By: TODD JASON LEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHUBB INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: TODD JASON LEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.H. MACK, LLC
Represented By: TODD JASON LEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE PINNACLE COMPANIES, LLC
Represented By: TODD JASON LEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE SIENA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: TODD JASON LEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PINNACLE INVESTMENT VENTURES, LLC
Represented By: TODD JASON LEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN LITT
Represented By: TODD JASON LEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KOHL PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: TODD JASON LEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEROD MEZZ, LLC
Represented By: TODD JASON LEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN M. STOLAR
Represented By: TODD JASON LEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: STEVEN SCHILDT
Represented By: STACEY MARIE ZAVALAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN T. COYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCHANTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GAETANO MERCOGLIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?