MOORE et al v. QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP. et al
Appellee: QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP., JOHN AND JANE DOE 0-100, NATIONSTAR LLC, LSI TITLE COMPANY, MERS, LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS, INC. and PMC BANCORP
Appellant: HYOJA AKIKO MOORE
Case Number: 2:2019cv12904
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Ryan P. Mulvaney, Esq. regarding Petition re #5 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MULVANEY, RYAN)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from HYOJA AKIKO MOORE re Petition. (dam, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Certification of Failure to File Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(dam, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN P. MULVANEY on behalf of MERS, NATIONSTAR LLC (MULVANEY, RYAN)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by HYOJA AKIKO MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Designation of Items, #2 Amended Affidavit of Service)(dam, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number Case No. 15-10174 (VFP), Adv. Pro. No. 16-1612 (VFP), filed by HYOJA AKIKO MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Attached IFP Application, #2 Order Under Appeal, #3 Transmittal)(dam, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOORE et al v. QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP.
Represented By: RYAN P. MULVANEY
Represented By: NICOLE LEONARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JOHN AND JANE DOE 0-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NATIONSTAR LLC
Represented By: RYAN P. MULVANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LSI TITLE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MERS
Represented By: RYAN P. MULVANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PMC BANCORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: HYOJA AKIKO MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?