MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 72.90.156.152
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 72.90.156.152
Case Number: 2:2019cv13418
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 MOTION For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 7/1/2019. (JB, )
June 22, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference . Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq., #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq., #4 Brief, #5 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law, #6 Exhibit B to Memorandum of Law, #7 Exhibit C to Memorandum of Law, #8 Certification of Related Cases, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(CERILLO, PATRICK)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 AO121 Copyright Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (JB, )
June 6, 2019 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (eu, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (CERILLO, PATRICK)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 72.90.156.152 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9719480) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certification of Interested Parties)(CERILLO, PATRICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 72.90.156.152
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 72.90.156.152
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: PATRICK JOSEPH CERILLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?