LEVY et al v. JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: THEODORE J LEVY and HELAINE A LEVY
Defendant: JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, JAGUAR LAND ROVER LIMITED and TATA MOTORS LIMITED
Case Number: 2:2019cv13497
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by JAGUAR LAND ROVER LIMITED. Responses due by 8/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint)(KELLNER, LELAND)
July 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, . Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, by JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC. Responses due by 7/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(KELLNER, LELAND)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JAGUAR LAND ROVER LIMITED, JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, TATA MOTORS LIMITED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (as, )
June 6, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
June 6, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Magistrate Judge James B. Clark no longer assigned to the case. (ak, )
June 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAGUAR LAND ROVER LIMITED, JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, TATA MOTORS LIMITED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9724619) with JURY DEMAND, filed by THEODORE J LEVY, HELAINE A LEVY. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(WEIDEN, JARED)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEVY et al v. JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Represented By: LELAND I. KELLNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAGUAR LAND ROVER LIMITED
Represented By: LELAND I. KELLNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TATA MOTORS LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THEODORE J LEVY
Represented By: JARED WEIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELAINE A LEVY
Represented By: JARED WEIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?