FIRST INDEMNITY OF AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY v. RAND et al
Plaintiff: FIRST INDEMNITY OF AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: YAFFA RAND and PINCUS RAND
Case Number: 2:2019cv13528
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FIRST INDEMNITY OF AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY. YAFFA RAND served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (ALONGI, PAUL)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FIRST INDEMNITY OF AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY. PINCUS RAND served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (ALONGI, PAUL)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PINCUS RAND, YAFFA RAND. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
June 7, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
June 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by FIRST INDEMNITY OF AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY as to PINCUS RAND, YAFFA RAND. (ALONGI, PAUL)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9726962), filed by FIRST INDEMNITY OF AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ALONGI, PAUL) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/10/2019) (JB, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIRST INDEMNITY OF AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY v. RAND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIRST INDEMNITY OF AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: PAUL A. ALONGI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YAFFA RAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PINCUS RAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?