BENTLEY et al v. LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Plaintiff: ROBERT DEGNER, SAM LEE, CHERYL ERVIN, MICHAEL BENTLEY and KATHLEEN MCCANN
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13554
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Benjamin F. Johns regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission of Adam E. Polk. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Benjamin F. Johns, #2 Certification of Adam E. Polk, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(JOHNS, BENJAMIN)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Benjamin F. Johns regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission of Daniel C. Girard. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Benjamin F. Johns, #2 Certification of Daniel C. Girard, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(JOHNS, BENJAMIN)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Benjamin F. Johns regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission of Simon S. Grille. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Benjamin F. Johns, #2 Certification of Simon S. Grille, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(JOHNS, BENJAMIN)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SAM LEE, MICHAEL BENTLEY, CHERYL ERVIN, KATHLEEN MCCANN, ROBERT DEGNER. LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (JOHNS, BENJAMIN)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by SAM LEE, MICHAEL BENTLEY, CHERYL ERVIN, ROBERT DEGNER.(JOHNS, BENJAMIN)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (vm)
June 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9727767) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SAM LEE, MICHAEL BENTLEY, CHERYL ERVIN, ROBERT DEGNER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JOHNS, BENJAMIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BENTLEY et al v. LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT DEGNER
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAM LEE
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL ERVIN
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BENTLEY
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN MCCANN
Represented By: BENJAMIN F. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?