VOSQUEZ v. A. PIGNA & SON MASON CONTRACTORS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SELVIN VOSQUEZ
Defendant: ENRICO PIGNA and A. PIGNA & SON MASON CONTRACTORS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13562
Filed: June 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Defendants A. Pigna & Son Mason Contractors, Inc. and Enrico Pigna individually, are granted leave to answer, move or otherwise reply to the Complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order. As this application was not required to be filed as a motion, the Court has treated it as an application on consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/5/2019. (sm)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (CASSIDY, DAVID)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SELVIN VOSQUEZ. A. PIGNA & SON MASON CONTRACTORS, INC. served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; ENRICO PIGNA served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(JAFFE, JODI)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to A. PIGNA & SON MASON CONTRACTORS, INC., ENRICO PIGNA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
June 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
June 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A. PIGNA & SON MASON CONTRACTORS, INC., ENRICO PIGNA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9728038) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SELVIN VOSQUEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(GLENN, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VOSQUEZ v. A. PIGNA & SON MASON CONTRACTORS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SELVIN VOSQUEZ
Represented By: ANDREW I. GLENN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENRICO PIGNA
Represented By: DAVID E. CASSIDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. PIGNA & SON MASON CONTRACTORS, INC.
Represented By: DAVID E. CASSIDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?