REDSTAGE WORLDWIDE LLC et al v. WORLD EMBLEM INTERNATIONAL
Plaintiff: FULCRUM WORLDWIDE INC. and REDSTAGE WORLDWIDE LLC
Defendant: WORLD EMBLEM INTERNATIONAL
Case Number: 2:2019cv13733
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JOSEPH FORINO on behalf of FULCRUM WORLDWIDE INC., REDSTAGE WORLDWIDE LLC (FORINO, MICHAEL)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for at 8/22/2019 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 8/2/19. (LM, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FULCRUM WORLDWIDE INC., REDSTAGE WORLDWIDE LLC. (PAPALIA, PATRICK)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 CLAIM Answer to Counterclaim by FULCRUM WORLDWIDE INC., REDSTAGE WORLDWIDE LLC. (PAPALIA, PATRICK)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against FULCRUM WORLDWIDE INC., REDSTAGE WORLDWIDE LLC by WORLD EMBLEM INTERNATIONAL.(EDWARDS, SHAWN)
June 26, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by WORLD EMBLEM INTERNATIONAL has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/5/2019. (sm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs' Complaint.. (EDWARDS, SHAWN)
June 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (jr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WORLD EMBLEM INTERNATIONAL from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number HUD-L-001890-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9742540), filed by WORLD EMBLEM INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(EDWARDS, SHAWN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REDSTAGE WORLDWIDE LLC et al v. WORLD EMBLEM INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FULCRUM WORLDWIDE INC.
Represented By: PATRICK PAPALIA
Represented By: MICHAEL JOSEPH FORINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REDSTAGE WORLDWIDE LLC
Represented By: PATRICK PAPALIA
Represented By: MICHAEL JOSEPH FORINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORLD EMBLEM INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: SHAWN DAVID EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?