LOPEZ ABREGO v. MCALNEENAM et al
Petitioner: MATEO LOPEZ ABREGO
Respondent: KEVIN MCALNEENAM, WILLIAM BARR, STEVEN AHRENDT, MARK MORGAN and KEVIN MCALEENAN
Case Number: 2:2019cv13755
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL as moot. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/18/2019. (ld, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from AUSA Hajdarpasic Regarding Request for Dismissal of Action As Moot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Warrant of Removal/Deportation, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 USCA Case Number 19-2470 for #6 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by MATEO LOPEZ ABREGO. USCA Case Manager Desiree (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3dwb, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, by MATEO LOPEZ ABREGO. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-9770630. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit oRDER BEING APPEALED FROM)(CORNEHLS, GRANT)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN terminated. Attorney ENES HAJDARPASIC for STEVEN AHRENDT,ENES HAJDARPASIC for WILLIAM BARR,ENES HAJDARPASIC for KEVIN MCALNEENAM,ENES HAJDARPASIC for MARK MORGAN added.. (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the portions of the petition that seek review of petitioners order of removal and that seek an injunction against his removal are dismissed upon preliminary screening; ORDER denying #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; ORDER that within forty-five (45) days of this entry respondents shall file and serve an answer, etc; ORDER that within forty-five (45) days of receipt of the answer, petitioner may file a reply to the answer, etc. (Notice mailed to respondents and petitioner; notice emailed to AUSA.). Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 6/18/2019. (as, )
June 18, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by G. CORNEHLS on 06/14/2019 was submitted incorrectly as a MOTION. For future filings of Proposed Orders, please use the event Letter and attach the Proposed Order. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (as, )
June 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty. (jr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by MATEO LOPEZ ABREGO re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (CORNEHLS, GRANT)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MATEO LOPEZ ABREGO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit Motion to Reopen, Part 1, #3 Exhibit Motion to Reopen, Part 2, #4 Exhibit Immigration Judge Decision, #5 Exhibit Petitioner's Brief on Appeal, Part 1, #6 Exhibit Petitioner's Brief on Appeal, Part 2, #7 Exhibit Board's Denial of Stay, #8 Exhibit Notice of Imminent Removal, #9 Exhibit DHS Opposition)(CORNEHLS, GRANT)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0312-9743419.), filed by Mateo Lopez Abrego. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Reopen, Part 1, #2 Exhibit Motion to Reopen, Part 2, #3 Exhibit Immigration Judge Decision, #4 Exhibit Petitioner's Brief on Appeal, Part 1, #5 Exhibit Petitioner's Brief on Appeal, Part 2, #6 Exhibit Board Decision Denying Stay, #7 Exhibit Notice of Imminent Removal, #8 Exhibit DHS Opposition)(CORNEHLS, GRANT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOPEZ ABREGO v. MCALNEENAM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MATEO LOPEZ ABREGO
Represented By: GRANT REED CORNEHLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN MCALNEENAM
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM BARR
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STEVEN AHRENDT
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MARK MORGAN
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN MCALEENAN
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?