CANO et al v. G.T. CAR WASH, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Leticia Rivas, Hector Hernandez, Rosa Melendez, Maira Hernandez, Victor Cano, Julio Sandoval, Teresa Moran, Oscar Cano, Lorena Palacios and Yolanda Duran
Defendant: G.T. Car Wash, Inc., Timothy Wiegel, George Kelly, Bruce Moler, TIMOTHY J WIEGEL, JOHN WIEGEL, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5 and JOHN DOES 1-5
Case Number: 2:2019cv13771
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by GEORGE KELLY, G.T. CAR WASH, INC., TIMOTHY WIEGEL has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/27/2019. (ld, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to G.T. Car Wash, Inc., George Kelly, and Timothy Weigel. Attorney JOSEPH E. GEHRING, JR for G.T. CAR WASH, INC.,JOSEPH E. GEHRING, JR for GEORGE KELLY,JOSEPH E. GEHRING, JR for TIMOTHY WIEGEL added. (GEHRING, JOSEPH)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VICTOR CANO. TIMOTHY WIEGEL waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (SCHLEY, MITCHELL)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VICTOR CANO. GEORGE KELLY waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (SCHLEY, MITCHELL)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VICTOR CANO. G.T. CAR WASH, INC. waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (SCHLEY, MITCHELL)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to G.T. CAR WASH, INC., GEORGE KELLY, BRUCE MOLER, TIMOTHY WIEGEL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
June 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
June 17, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Parties are to be entered in all capital letters . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint by Victor Cano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCHLEY, MITCHELL)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against G.T. Car Wash, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9744074), filed by Victor Cano.(SCHLEY, MITCHELL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CANO et al v. G.T. CAR WASH, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Rivas
Represented By: MITCHELL A SCHLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Hernandez
Represented By: MITCHELL A SCHLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Melendez
Represented By: MITCHELL A SCHLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maira Hernandez
Represented By: MITCHELL A SCHLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Cano
Represented By: MITCHELL A SCHLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Sandoval
Represented By: MITCHELL A SCHLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Moran
Represented By: MITCHELL A SCHLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Cano
Represented By: MITCHELL A SCHLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorena Palacios
Represented By: MITCHELL A SCHLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Duran
Represented By: MITCHELL A SCHLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.T. Car Wash, Inc.
Represented By: JOSEPH E. GEHRING, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Wiegel
Represented By: JOSEPH E. GEHRING, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Kelly
Represented By: JOSEPH E. GEHRING, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Moler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY J WIEGEL
Represented By: JOSEPH E. GEHRING, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN WIEGEL
Represented By: JOSEPH E. GEHRING, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?