WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY v. RIDGE TOOL COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: RIDGE TOOL COMPANY and EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13882
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 9/28/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/28/2019. (jqb, )
July 12, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment by EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.. Responses due by 7/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Statement of material facts in support of Emerson Electric Co.'s motion for summary judgment, #2 Certification of James Hamm in support of Emerson Electric Co.'s motion for summary judgment, #3 Certification of Joseph DiRienzo in support of Emerson Electric Co.'s motion for summary judgment, #4 Exhibit A to DiRienzo Certification - plaintiff's complaint, #5 Exhibit B to DiRienzo Certification - Notice of Removal with attachments, #6 Brief in support of Emerson Electric Co.'s motion for summary judgment)(DIRIENZO, JOSEPH)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RIDGE TOOL COMPANY identifying Emerson Electric Co. as Corporate Parent.. (DIRIENZO, JOSEPH)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by RIDGE TOOL COMPANY.(DIRIENZO, JOSEPH)
June 19, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (eu, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RIDGE TOOL COMPANY, EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. from New Jersey Superior Court, Law Div., Essex Co., case number L-3896-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9747014), filed by RIDGE TOOL COMPANY, EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal)(DIRIENZO, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY v. RIDGE TOOL COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIDGE TOOL COMPANY
Represented By: JOSEPH DIRIENZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.
Represented By: JOSEPH DIRIENZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?