LYNCH SINCE 1940, LLC v. JEST TEXTILES, INC.
Plaintiff: LYNCH SINCE 1940, LLC
Defendant: JEST TEXTILES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13909
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by JEST TEXTILES, INC..(GUARINO, PHILIP)
July 22, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #10 Order submitted by JEST TEXTILES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/29/2019. (JB, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER Granting #9 Letter from PHILIP GUARINO requesting a 14-day extension of time to file an answer for #1 Complaint.. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/19/2019. (JB, )
July 13, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from PHILIP GUARINO re #1 Complaint. (GUARINO, PHILIP)
July 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP L. GUARINO on behalf of JEST TEXTILES, INC. (GUARINO, PHILIP)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 AO121 Copyright Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JB, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LYNCH SINCE 1940, LLC. JEST TEXTILES, INC. served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (FESTA, TAYLOR)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by TAYLOR PAIGE FESTA on behalf of LYNCH SINCE 1940, LLC (FESTA, TAYLOR)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JEST TEXTILES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD FREDERICK BEHM on behalf of LYNCH SINCE 1940, LLC (BEHM, EDWARD)
June 18, 2019 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (eu, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LYNCH SINCE 1940, LLC. (DESIDERATO, JERRY)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JEST TEXTILES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9748552) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LYNCH SINCE 1940, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DESIDERATO, JERRY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LYNCH SINCE 1940, LLC v. JEST TEXTILES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEST TEXTILES, INC.
Represented By: PHILIP L. GUARINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNCH SINCE 1940, LLC
Represented By: JERRY R. DESIDERATO
Represented By: EDWARD FREDERICK BEHM
Represented By: TAYLOR PAIGE FESTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?