J.A. LEE ELECTRIC SERVICES, LLC v. SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC BUILDINGS AMERICAS, INC.
Plaintiff: J.A. LEE ELECTRIC SERVICES, LLC
Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC BUILDINGS AMERICAS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv13954
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against J.A. LEE ELECTRIC SERVICES, LLC by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC BUILDINGS AMERICAS, INC..(ROSEN, MARK)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Mark A. Rosen re Clerk's Entry of Default. (ROSEN, MARK)
July 22, 2019 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC BUILDINGS AMERICAS, INC. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (dam, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Default by J.A. LEE ELECTRIC SERVICES, LLC against Schneider Electric Buildings Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Christian J. Jensen, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(JENSEN, CHRISTIAN)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC BUILDINGS AMERICAS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
June 19, 2019 Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (eu, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by J.A. LEE ELECTRIC SERVICES, LLC as to SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC BUILDINGS AMERICAS, INC.. (JENSEN, CHRISTIAN)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.A. LEE ELECTRIC SERVICES, LLC. (JENSEN, CHRISTIAN)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC BUILDINGS AMERICAS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9752378), filed by J.A. LEE ELECTRIC SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JENSEN, CHRISTIAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.A. LEE ELECTRIC SERVICES, LLC v. SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC BUILDINGS AMERICAS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC BUILDINGS AMERICAS, INC.
Represented By: MARK A. ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.A. LEE ELECTRIC SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: CHRISTIAN JOHN JENSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?