WARREN v. STEVEN J. KAY ASSOCIATES et al
Plaintiff: Danny Warren
Defendant: Steven J. Kaye Associates and Edison Park Fast
Case Number: 2:2019cv14116
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 USMS 285 FORM RETURNED. (ams, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EDISON PARK FAST, STEVEN J. KAYE ASSOCIATES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel without prejudice to a reapplication, should developments in the case warrant it. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/15/2019. (byl)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 USMS 285 FORM RETURNED. (ams, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel by DANNY WARREN. (byl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (byl) Two USM285 forms mail to Plaintiff on 7/9/19.
June 25, 2019 COMPLAINT against Edison Park Fast, Steven J. Kaye Associates with JURY DEMAND, filed by Danny Warren. See D.E. 1 Complaint(byl)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Granting #2 Motion for Leave to File IFP #5 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. See #1 Complaint, etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 6/25/2019. (byl)
June 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-03558. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: This action is hereby transferred, in the interest of justice, to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. See 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The Court offers no opinion on the merits or timeliness of the action. That provision of Rule 83.1 of the Local Rules of the Eastern District of New York which requires a seven-day delay is waived. Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 6/18/2019. C/mailed to Pro se Plaintiff.(Tavarez, Jennifer)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Danny Warren. (Williams, Erica)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edison Park Fast, Steven J. Kaye Associates, filed by Danny Warren. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Erica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARREN v. STEVEN J. KAY ASSOCIATES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven J. Kaye Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison Park Fast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?