Comtron, Corp. v. Abira Medical Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: Comtron, Corp.
Defendant: DXGenesis Healthcare Private Limited, Abira Medical Laboratories, Mohammed Haaris, Alan J Miller and Natalie Marie Skochinsky
Case Number: 2:2019cv14117
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 32 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney NEAL WIESNER terminated.. (ASLANIAN, ANTRANIG)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that the time for the responding papers on behalf of the Plaintiff be extended two weeks. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/6/2019. (ld, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 30 Letter from Antranig Aslanian, Jr., Esq.. (ASLANIAN, ANTRANIG)
July 31, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Opposition to Preliminary Injunction. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Opposition to Preliminary Injunction by Abira Medical Laboratories, Alan J Miller, Natalie Marie Skochinsky. Responses due by 8/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Opposition to Preliminary Injunction and in support of Cross-Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certification of Joseph Fiorenzo, with exhibits, #3 Declaration of Alan Miller, with exhibits, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(FIORENZO, JOSEPH)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's application for temporary restraints and an order to show cause, filed with the #26 Amended Complaint, is DENIED. Defendant's deadline to oppose the application for preliminary injunctive relief is 7/29/19; Plaintiff's deadline to respond is 8/5/19. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 7/17/19. (Fiore, J)
July 16, 2019 Filing 27 Letter from Joseph Fiorenzo. (FIORENZO, JOSEPH)
July 15, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Comtron, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Certification Certification in Support, #10 Brief Memorandum in Support, #11 Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause)(HIRSCH, RANDALL)
July 8, 2019 Filing 25 Letter from Joseph Fiorenzo. (FIORENZO, JOSEPH)
July 1, 2019 Filing 24 Letter from Joseph B. Fiorenzo regarding preliminary injunction proceedings. (FIORENZO, JOSEPH)
July 1, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Status Conference held on 7/1/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder Megan McKaye Soule.) (lr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 22 Letter from Joseph B. Fiorenzo regarding status update re 16 Order,. (FIORENZO, JOSEPH)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 Letter from Neal Wiesner. (WIESNER, NEAL)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of counsel's joint request [cm/ecf #19] for an adjournment of the status conference scheduled for Monday, July 9, 2019 at 9:00 am. Counsel's request for an adjournment is DENIED. The parties are now scheduled to appear on Monday, July 9, 2019 at 8:15 am, Newark Post Office Building Courtroom 1. In addition, as indicated in the Courts prior order of June 26, 2019, the parties are to file a summary/status report of no more than two (2) pages by June 28, 2019. SO ORDERED by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 06/28/2019. (lr, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from Joseph Fiorenzo re 16 Order,. (FIORENZO, JOSEPH)
June 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN M. KLEIN on behalf of Abira Medical Laboratories, Alan J Miller, Natalie Marie Skochinsky (KLEIN, STEPHEN)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH B. FIORENZO on behalf of Abira Medical Laboratories, Alan J Miller, Natalie Marie Skochinsky (FIORENZO, JOSEPH)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: A status conference has been set for Monday, July 1, 2019 at 9:00 am in Newark Post Office Building Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. The parties are to file a summary/status report of no more than 2 pages by June 28, 2019. It is further ordered that clients and/or representatives with full settlement authority must be present. SO ORDERED by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 06/26/2019. (lr, )
June 26, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre and Judge Susan D. Wigenton no longer assigned to case. (eu, )
June 24, 2019 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-03429. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. 28 U.S.C. 1404. The Court offers no opinion on the merits of the action. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 6/19/2019. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Comtron, Corp.. Alan J Miller served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Wiesner, Neal)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Comtron, Corp.. Natalie Marie Skochinsky served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Wiesner, Neal)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Comtron, Corp.. (Wiesner, Neal)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Comtron, Corp.. DXGenesis Healthcare Private Limited served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Wiesner, Neal)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Comtron, Corp.. Abira Medical Laboratories served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Wiesner, Neal)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY in Support re #6 Order to Show Cause,,, Preliminary Injunction,,, Temporary Restraining Order,, filed by Comtron, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Reply, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service) (Wiesner, Neal)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Hirsch on behalf of Comtron, Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Hirsch, Randall)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the above-named defendants show cause before this Court in Room 6H North of the United States Courthouse, at 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201, on June 19, 2019 at 3:30 P.M. in the afternoon or as soon thereafter as counsel may be heard why an Order should not issue pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (See Order for details) SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 6/12/2019. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William Robert Tellado on behalf of Abira Medical Laboratories, Alan J Miller, Natalie Marie Skochinsky (notification declined or already on case) (Tellado, William)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Abira Medical Laboratories, Alan J Miller, Natalie Marie Skochinsky (Attachments: #1 Certification of William R. Tellado, #2 Exh A to Tellado Certification - Verified Complaint, #3 Exh B to Tellado Certification - Software Agreement between Comtron and Abira, #4 Exh C to Tellado Certification - Billing-Services Agreements, #5 Exh D to Tellado Certification - Order to Show Cause With Temporary Restraints, #6 Exh E to Tellado Certification - Excerpts of the Transcript, #7 Exh F to Tellado Certification - Comtron's Application for an Order to Show Cause, #8 Declaration of Alan Miller, #9 Exh A to Miller Declaration - LinkedIn Profile of Mohammed Haaris) (Tellado, William)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11561881 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Comtron, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Declaration in Support, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J) (Wiesner, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comtron, Corp. v. Abira Medical Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DXGenesis Healthcare Private Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abira Medical Laboratories
Represented By: WILLIAM ROBERT TELLADO
Represented By: STEPHEN M. KLEIN
Represented By: JOSEPH B. FIORENZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Haaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan J Miller
Represented By: WILLIAM ROBERT TELLADO
Represented By: STEPHEN M. KLEIN
Represented By: JOSEPH B. FIORENZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Marie Skochinsky
Represented By: WILLIAM ROBERT TELLADO
Represented By: STEPHEN M. KLEIN
Represented By: JOSEPH B. FIORENZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comtron, Corp.
Represented By: Randall Hirsch
Represented By: Neal Eugene Wiesner
Represented By: NEAL WIESNER
Represented By: RANDALL JOEL HIRSCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?