MOE et al v. WOODBRIDGE et al
Plaintiff: K. O., MARY MOE and JANE DOE
Defendant: DEF CORP 1-10, SUPERVISOR PAULA POE 1-10, GHI CORP. 1-10, CITY OF SOUTH AMBOY, KEISHA RIDLY, ABC CORP 1-10, SARGEANT RICHARD WOJACZYK, BOB BOE 1-10, DETECTIVE PATRICK HARRIS, HAYDEE ZAMORA-DALTON, POLICE DIRECTOR ROBERT HUBNER, DETECTIVE NICOLE HUBNER, DETECTIVE SHAYNE BODNAR, SUPERIOR POLICE OFFICER ROB ROE 1-10, POLICE CHIEF DARREN LAVIGNE, POLICE OFFICER JOHN DOE 1-20, PATROLMAN JEIAN RASTEGARPANAH, DETECTIVE JUAN CARLOS BONILLA, JR., JACQUELINE CARDONA, TOWNSHIP OF WOODBRIDGE, DETECTIVE BRIAN JAREMCZAK, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, CHRISTINE NORBUT BEYER, MSW, PATROLMAN ROBERT BESNER, CHIEF LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER CAPTAIN ROY HOPPOCK, DEPUTY POLICE DIRECTOR JOSEPH NISKY and CARMEN DIAZ-PETTI
Case Number: 2:2019cv14139
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/7/19. (jbb)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CITY OF SOUTH AMBOY, CHIEF LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER CAPTAIN ROY HOPPOCK, POLICE DIRECTOR ROBERT HUBNER, POLICE CHIEF DARREN LAVIGNE, DEPUTY POLICE DIRECTOR JOSEPH NISKY, TOWNSHIP OF WOODBRIDGE.(BARATZ, ALAN)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PATROLMAN ROBERT BESNER, DETECTIVE SHAYNE BODNAR, DETECTIVE JUAN CARLOS BONILLA, JR., JACQUELINE CARDONA, CITY OF SOUTH AMBOY, CARMEN DIAZ-PETTI, DETECTIVE PATRICK HARRIS, CHIEF LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER CAPTAIN ROY HOPPOCK, DETECTIVE NICOLE HUBNER, POLICE DIRECTOR ROBERT HUBNER, DETECTIVE BRIAN JAREMCZAK, POLICE CHIEF DARREN LAVIGNE, DEPUTY POLICE DIRECTOR JOSEPH NISKY, CHRISTINE NORBUT BEYER, MSW, PATROLMAN JEIAN RASTEGARPANAH, KEISHA RIDLY, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, SARGEANT RICHARD WOJACZYK, TOWNSHIP OF WOODBRIDGE, HAYDEE ZAMORA-DALTON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (byl)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (eu, )
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9762419) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARY MOE, JANE DOE, K. O.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(ARNOLD, ROSEMARIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOE et al v. WOODBRIDGE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF CORP 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPERVISOR PAULA POE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHI CORP. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF SOUTH AMBOY
Represented By: ALAN J. BARATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEISHA RIDLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARGEANT RICHARD WOJACZYK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOB BOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE PATRICK HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAYDEE ZAMORA-DALTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE DIRECTOR ROBERT HUBNER
Represented By: ALAN J. BARATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE NICOLE HUBNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE SHAYNE BODNAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPERIOR POLICE OFFICER ROB ROE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE CHIEF DARREN LAVIGNE
Represented By: ALAN J. BARATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER JOHN DOE 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATROLMAN JEIAN RASTEGARPANAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE JUAN CARLOS BONILLA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACQUELINE CARDONA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWNSHIP OF WOODBRIDGE
Represented By: ALAN J. BARATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE BRIAN JAREMCZAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE NORBUT BEYER, MSW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATROLMAN ROBERT BESNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIEF LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER CAPTAIN ROY HOPPOCK
Represented By: ALAN J. BARATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY POLICE DIRECTOR JOSEPH NISKY
Represented By: ALAN J. BARATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARMEN DIAZ-PETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. O.
Represented By: ROSEMARIE ARNOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY MOE
Represented By: ROSEMARIE ARNOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: ROSEMARIE ARNOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?