CMA CGM S.A. v. BIOMASS PRO, INC.
Plaintiff: CMA CGM S.A.
Defendant: Biomass Pro, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv14388
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:741
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, Plaintiff, CMA CGM S.A. hereby dismisses the above-captioned matter without prejudice, etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 7/8/2019. (JB, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CMA CGM S.A. (STEINBERG, RICK)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BIOMASS PRO, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (byl)
June 27, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, )
June 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CMA CGM S.A.. (STEINBERG, RICK)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Biomass Pro, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9776528), filed by CMA CGM S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Account, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(STEINBERG, RICK) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/28/2019) (byl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CMA CGM S.A. v. BIOMASS PRO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomass Pro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMA CGM S.A.
Represented By: RICK A. STEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?