DUMOND v. MERCEDES BENZ USA, LLC et al

Plaintiff: LEIKA DUMOND
Defendant: MERCEDES BENZ USA, LLC and DAIMLER AG
Case Number: 2:2019cv14723
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JOINT CONSENT ORDER extending Defendants Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC time to file a responsive answer, move or otherwise plead with respect to the Complaint until 9/18/2019; a copy of this Order shall be served upon all counsel of record within 7 days of the date hereof. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/16/2019. (sm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC with Proposed Joint Consent Order Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GLADBACH, ERIC)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that the motion at ECF #4 shall be terminated by the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/6/2019. (sm)
August 6, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #15 submitted by MERCEDES BENZ USA, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/19/2019. (sm)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (GLADBACH, ERIC)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCEDES BENZ USA, LLC identifying Daimler North America Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (GLADBACH, ERIC)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC FRANCIS GLADBACH on behalf of MERCEDES BENZ USA, LLC (GLADBACH, ERIC)
July 31, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ADAM A. EDWARDS, GREGORY F. COLEMAN and MARK E. SILVEY, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sms)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LEIKA DUMOND. MERCEDES BENZ USA, LLC served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (BREIT, MITCHELL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Mark E. Silvey to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9845279.) (BREIT, MITCHELL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Gregory F. Coleman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9845256.) (BREIT, MITCHELL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Adam A. Edwards to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9845243.) (BREIT, MITCHELL)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #5 , #6 and #7 as to Adam A. Edwards, Gregory F. Coleman and Mark E. Silvey; counsel shall each make payments to the new Jersey Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection and shall each pay $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/24/2019. (sm)
July 23, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam A. Edwards, #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory F. Coleman, #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark E. Silvey. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark E. Silvey by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BREIT, MITCHELL)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory F. Coleman by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BREIT, MITCHELL)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam A. Edwards by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BREIT, MITCHELL)
July 17, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server by LEIKA DUMOND. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BREIT, MITCHELL)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint by LEIKA DUMOND. (BREIT, MITCHELL)
July 9, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAIMLER AG, MERCEDES BENZ USA, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9792070) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LEIKA DUMOND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BREIT, MITCHELL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUMOND v. MERCEDES BENZ USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCEDES BENZ USA, LLC
Represented By: ERIC FRANCIS GLADBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIMLER AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEIKA DUMOND
Represented By: MITCHELL MARK BREIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?