CELGENE CORPORATION v. CIPLA LIMITED
Plaintiff: CELGENE CORPORATION
Defendant: CIPLA LIMITED
Case Number: 2:2019cv14731
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against CELGENE CORPORATION by CIPLA LIMITED.(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CIPLA LIMITED. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CELGENE CORPORATION. CIPLA LIMITED waiver sent on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID LEIGH MOSES on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (MOSES, DAVID)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (BATON, WILLIAM)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 AO120 Patent Form filed (next 5 patents). (jr)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 AO120 Patent Form filed. (jr)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CIPLA LIMITED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
July 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CELGENE CORPORATION. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CIPLA LIMITED ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9792152), filed by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CELGENE CORPORATION v. CIPLA LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CELGENE CORPORATION
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: DAVID LEIGH MOSES
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIPLA LIMITED
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?