MIRAMBEAUX v. MCALEENAN et al
Defendant: DHS, ESSEX COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY and ICE
Petitioner: MIGUEL ANTONIO MIRAMBEAUX
Respondent: ACTING SECRETARY DHS KEVIN K MCALEENAN, MARK A MORGAN and ALFARO ORTIZ
Case Number: 2:2019cv14739
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN terminated. Attorney ENES HAJDARPASIC for KEVIN K MCALEENAN,ENES HAJDARPASIC for MARK A MORGAN,ENES HAJDARPASIC for ALFARO ORTIZ added.. (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER, that the Clerk of the Court shall serve copies of the Petition and this Order upon the Warden of Essex and it is further that the Clerk of the Court shall forward a copy of the Petition and this Order to Chief, Civil Division, United States Attorney's Office as the following email address:USANJ-HabeasCases@usdoj.gov and that, within 45 days after the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall electronically file a full and complete answer, etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 7/29/2019. (JB, )
July 9, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo added. (eu, )
July 8, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 0312-9792300 received on 7/3/2019 (jr)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by MIGUEL ANTONIO MIRAMBEAUX. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CAMILO, JASON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MIRAMBEAUX v. MCALEENAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MIGUEL ANTONIO MIRAMBEAUX
Represented By: JASON SCOTT CAMILO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESSEX COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ACTING SECRETARY DHS KEVIN K MCALEENAN
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MARK A MORGAN
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ALFARO ORTIZ
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?