DE CASTILLO v. BARR et al
Petitioner: FANNY LEON DE CASTILLO
Respondent: RONALD EDWARDS, WILLIAM B. BARR, PAULO CORREIA and KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Case Number: 2:2019cv14815
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by RONALD EDWARDS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Exhibits A-H, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(BAJADA, FRANCES)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Certification on behalf of FANNY LEON DE CASTILLO Re #4 Letter. (BAJADA, FRANCES)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Letter request for extension of time to respond to Petition. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/26/2019. (vm )
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from AUSA Frances C. Bajada. (BAJADA, FRANCES)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN terminated. Attorney FRANCES C. BAJADA for RONALD EDWARDS added.. (BAJADA, FRANCES)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Petitioner's request to proceed in forma pauperis (D.E. #1 ) is GRANTED; ORDER that respondents William B. Barr, Kirstjen Nielsen, and Paulo Correia are dismissed with prejudice; ORDER that within forty-five (45) days after the date of entry of this Order, Ronald Edwards shall electronically file an answer to the Petition; ORDER that Petitioner may file and serve a reply within thirty (30) days after the answer is filed, etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 7/11/2019. (as, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by FANNY LEON DE CASTILLO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(th, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DE CASTILLO v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FANNY LEON DE CASTILLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD EDWARDS
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: FRANCES C. BAJADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM B. BARR
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PAULO CORREIA
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?