TANASKOVIC v. REALOGY HOLDINGS CORP. et al
Plaintiff: SASA TANASKOVIC
Defendant: REALOGY HOLDINGS CORP., RICHARD A. SMITH, RYAN M. SCHNEIDER, ANTHONY E. HULL and TIMOTHY B. GUSTAVSON
Case Number: 2:2019cv15053
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Waiver of Service and Scheduling a Response to the Complaint. Defts TIMOTHY B. GUSTAVSON, ANTHONY E. HULL, REALOGY HOLDINGS CORP., RYAN M. SCHNEIDER, RICHARD A. SMITH hereby waive service of summons and accept service of the Initial Complaint, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/29/2019. (th, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON CONSNET GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF SUSAN L. SALTZTEIN; shall pay the fee to the New Jersey lawyer's Fund for Client Protection and pay $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/19/2019. (sm)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from James W. Brown to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Susan L. Saltzstein. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James W. Brown in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Susan L. Saltzstein, #2 Certification of Susan L. Saltzstein in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BROWN, JAMES)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE AND SCHEDULING A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT by TIMOTHY B. GUSTAVSON, ANTHONY E. HULL, REALOGY HOLDINGS CORP., RYAN M. SCHNEIDER, RICHARD A. SMITH. (BROWN, JAMES)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by REALOGY HOLDINGS CORP.. (BROWN, JAMES)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES W. BROWN on behalf of TIMOTHY B. GUSTAVSON, ANTHONY E. HULL, REALOGY HOLDINGS CORP., RYAN M. SCHNEIDER, RICHARD A. SMITH (BROWN, JAMES)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TIMOTHY B. GUSTAVSON, ANTHONY E. HULL, REALOGY HOLDINGS CORP., RYAN M. SCHNEIDER, RICHARD A. SMITH. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
July 11, 2019 Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (eu, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SASA TANASKOVIC. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by SASA TANASKOVIC as to TIMOTHY B. GUSTAVSON, ANTHONY E. HULL, REALOGY HOLDINGS CORP., RYAN M. SCHNEIDER, RICHARD A. SMITH. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TIMOTHY B. GUSTAVSON, ANTHONY E. HULL, REALOGY HOLDINGS CORP., RYAN M. SCHNEIDER, RICHARD A. SMITH ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9806987) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SASA TANASKOVIC. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ROSEN, LAURENCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TANASKOVIC v. REALOGY HOLDINGS CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SASA TANASKOVIC
Represented By: LAURENCE M. ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REALOGY HOLDINGS CORP.
Represented By: JAMES W. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD A. SMITH
Represented By: JAMES W. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN M. SCHNEIDER
Represented By: JAMES W. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY E. HULL
Represented By: JAMES W. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY B. GUSTAVSON
Represented By: JAMES W. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?