STANGL et al v. LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Plaintiff: MELISSA CUPP, EDWARD STANGL and ANN MARIE STANGL
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv15185
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Shanon J. Carson, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/21/2019. (vm )
July 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shanon J. Carson. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shanon J. Carson by MELISSA CUPP, ANN MARIE STANGL, EDWARD STANGL. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Amey J. Park, #2 Certification of Shanon J. Carson, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PARK, AMEY)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE DEUTSCH on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DEUTSCH, LAWRENCE)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JACOB MARC POLAKOFF on behalf of All Plaintiffs (POLAKOFF, JACOB)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (th, )
July 12, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (eu, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9809007) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EDWARD STANGL, MELISSA CUPP, ANN MARIE STANGL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(PARK, AMEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STANGL et al v. LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA CUPP
Represented By: AMEY JIYOUNG PARK
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEUTSCH
Represented By: JACOB MARC POLAKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD STANGL
Represented By: AMEY JIYOUNG PARK
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEUTSCH
Represented By: JACOB MARC POLAKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANN MARIE STANGL
Represented By: AMEY JIYOUNG PARK
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEUTSCH
Represented By: JACOB MARC POLAKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?