AL-GOUDI AL-HASANI v. MCALEENAN et al
Defendant: USCIS ACTING DIR. KENNETH T CUCCINELLI, PAULO CORREIA and KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Petitioner: Muhanad AL-GOUDI AL-HASANI
Respondent: KENNETH T CUCCINELLI
Case Number: 2:2019cv15186
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/21/2019. (vm )
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION of Dismissal By Consent by PAULO CORREIA, KENNETH T CUCCINELLI, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN. (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ENES HAJDARPASIC on behalf of PAULO CORREIA, KENNETH T CUCCINELLI, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PAULO CORREIA, KENNETH T CUCCINELLI, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (th, )
July 12, 2019 Judge Esther Salas added. (eu, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9809058), filed by Muhanad AL-GOUDI AL-HASANI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(HUGHES, ANWEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AL-GOUDI AL-HASANI v. MCALEENAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS ACTING DIR. KENNETH T CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULO CORREIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Muhanad AL-GOUDI AL-HASANI
Represented By: ANWEN SARAH HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KENNETH T CUCCINELLI
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?