BELMORA LLC v. AMERICAN PRIVATE LABEL PRODUCTS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BELMORA LLC
Defendant: ANA WOOD, JOHN DOES 1 - 50, AMERICAN PRIVATE LABEL PRODUCTS, LLC and JAMES WOOD
Case Number: 2:2019cv15365
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (vm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint by AMERICAN PRIVATE LABEL PRODUCTS, LLC, ANA WOOD, JAMES WOOD. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
August 16, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to JASON A. SNYDERMAN and HUAOU YAN: $ 300, receipt number NEW040331 (dam, )
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Letter requesting the Pro Hac Vice Admission of JASON A. SNYDERMAN and HUAOU YAN. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/8/2019. (dam, )
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Extending Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond re #6 Stipulation. Defendants AMERICAN PRIVATE LABEL PRODUCTS, LLC, ANA WOOD, and JAMES WOOD shall have until and including 9/6/2019 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Verified Complaint in the above-captioned matter. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/7/2019. (dam, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Stephen M. Orlofsky, Esquire. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Orlofsky, Esquire, #2 Declaration Jason A. Snyderman, Esquire, #3 Declaration of Huaou Yan, Esquire, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL RAY DARBEE on behalf of AMERICAN PRIVATE LABEL PRODUCTS, LLC, ANA WOOD, JAMES WOOD (DARBEE, MICHAEL)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond by AMERICAN PRIVATE LABEL PRODUCTS, LLC, ANA WOOD, JAMES WOOD. (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY on behalf of AMERICAN PRIVATE LABEL PRODUCTS, LLC, ANA WOOD, JAMES WOOD (ORLOFSKY, STEPHEN)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN PRIVATE LABEL PRODUCTS, LLC, ANA WOOD, JAMES WOOD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (bt, )
July 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BELMORA LLC. (GOLUB, ALAN)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN PRIVATE LABEL PRODUCTS, LLC, JOHN DOES 1 - 50, ANA WOOD, JAMES WOOD ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9814598) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BELMORA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(GOLUB, ALAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELMORA LLC v. AMERICAN PRIVATE LABEL PRODUCTS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANA WOOD
Represented By: MICHAEL RAY DARBEE
Represented By: STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1 - 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN PRIVATE LABEL PRODUCTS, LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL RAY DARBEE
Represented By: STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES WOOD
Represented By: MICHAEL RAY DARBEE
Represented By: STEPHEN M. ORLOFSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BELMORA LLC
Represented By: ALAN S. GOLUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?