CELGENE CORPORATION v. HETERO LABS LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: CELGENE CORPORATION
Defendant: HETERO USA, INC., HETERO LABS LIMITED, HETERO DRUGS LIMITED and HETERO LABS LIMITED UNIT-V
Case Number: 2:2019cv15449
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document submitted by HETERO DRUGS LIMITED, HETERO LABS LIMITED UNIT-V, HETERO LABS LIMITED, HETERO USA, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/11/2019. (JB, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Defendants Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero Drug Limited, and Hetero USA, Inc. accept service of the Complaint and shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 10/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/10/2019. (JB, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Celgene to the Hon. Leda D. Wettre, U.S.M.J.. (BATON, WILLIAM)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (th, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID LEIGH MOSES on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (MOSES, DAVID)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (SULLIVAN, SARAH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (BATON, WILLIAM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HETERO DRUGS LIMITED, HETERO LABS LIMITED, HETERO LABS LIMITED UNIT-V, HETERO USA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (vm)
July 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CELGENE CORPORATION. (LIZZA, CHARLES)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HETERO DRUGS LIMITED, HETERO LABS LIMITED, HETERO LABS LIMITED UNIT-V, HETERO USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9820477), filed by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CELGENE CORPORATION v. HETERO LABS LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CELGENE CORPORATION
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: DAVID LEIGH MOSES
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETERO USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETERO LABS LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETERO DRUGS LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETERO LABS LIMITED UNIT-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?