SKEAHAN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: WILLIAM SKEAHAN
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 2:2019cv15451
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF PRIMARY CONTENTIONS by WILLIAM SKEAHAN. (HOBBIE, GREGG)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER; Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 9.1(d)(1) that the plaintiff will serve and electronically file a statement of the primary contentions or arguments for relief by September 13, 2019; Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 9.1(d)(2) that the SSA will serve and electronically file a response stating whether it agrees that the plaintiff is entitled to relief by October 14, 2019; and the parties must send a courtesy copy of their briefs to the Office of the Clerk of the Court, addressed for delivery to the Chambers of District Court Judge Claire C. Cecchi; etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/30/2019. (sms)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Administrative Record Filed - Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10)(DOGGETT, QUINN)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by QUINN E.N. DOGGETT on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (DOGGETT, QUINN)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILLIAM SKEAHAN. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 7/29/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (HOBBIE, GREGG)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (vm)
July 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi. (ak, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9820511), filed by WILLIAM SKEAHAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HOBBIE, GREGG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SKEAHAN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM SKEAHAN
Represented By: GREGG M. HOBBIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: QUINN E.N. DOGGETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?