FERRARI FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. v. NICOTRA et al
Plaintiff: FERRARI FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: DENNIS NICOTRA, PREMIER MOTOR CARS, LLC and CUNNINGHAM GULLWING GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv15585
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DENNIS NICOTRA, PREMIER MOTOR CARS, LLC AND CUNNINGHAM GULLWING GROUP, LLC AND CONSENTING TO THE FILING OF A RESPONSIVE PLEADING OUT OF TIME. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/4/2019. (vm )
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Vacating Clerk's Entry of Default by All Defendants. (DOBBS, SETH)
September 3, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #9 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint in lieu of Answer. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (vm )
September 2, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by FERRARI FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. re #9 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint in lieu of Answer (CHRISTIE, SCOTT)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #9 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint in lieu of Answer by CUNNINGHAM GULLWING GROUP, LLC, DENNIS NICOTRA, PREMIER MOTOR CARS, LLC. (DOBBS, SETH)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint in lieu of Answer by All Defendants. Responses due by 8/30/2019 (DOBBS, SETH)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH L. DOBBS on behalf of All Defendants (DOBBS, SETH)
August 13, 2019 *** VACATED See Order # 13, Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Dennis Nicotra, Premier Motor Cars, LLC and Cunningham Gullwing Group, LLC for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (vm, ) Modified on 9/4/2019 (vm, ).
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Default by FERRARI FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Request for Certificate of Default, #2 Certificate of Default)(CHRISTIE, SCOTT)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FERRARI FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.. CUNNINGHAM GULLWING GROUP, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (CHRISTIE, SCOTT)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FERRARI FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.. PREMIER MOTOR CARS, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (CHRISTIE, SCOTT)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FERRARI FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.. DENNIS NICOTRA served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (CHRISTIE, SCOTT)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CUNNINGHAM GULLWING GROUP, LLC, DENNIS NICOTRA, PREMIER MOTOR CARS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, )
July 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FERRARI FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. identifying Ferrari SpA and Ferrari NV as Corporate Parent.. (CHRISTIE, SCOTT)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9828005), filed by FERRARI FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(CHRISTIE, SCOTT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FERRARI FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. v. NICOTRA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS NICOTRA
Represented By: SETH L. DOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIER MOTOR CARS, LLC
Represented By: SETH L. DOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUNNINGHAM GULLWING GROUP, LLC
Represented By: SETH L. DOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERRARI FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: SCOTT S. CHRISTIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?