L'OREAL USA, INC. v. WORMSER CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: L'OREAL USA, INC.
Defendant: WORMSER CORPORATION and PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv15609
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, Plaintiff hereby gives notice that the claims asserted against Defendants Wormser Corporation and Process Technologies, LLC d/b/a Process Technologies and Packaging are hereby voluntarily dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/23/2019. (JB, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by L'OREAL USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service for Notice of Voluntary Dismissal w/o Prejudice)(RYSAVY, CHARLES)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #7 Stipulation. The time for Process Technologies to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until 9/30/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/15/2019. (dam, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; that the time for Wormser to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in the above-captioned matter is hereby extended until September 12, 2019.. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/14/2019. (ld, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (HEWIT, RUSSELL)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Wormser Corporation to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by WORMSER CORPORATION. (GILLETTE, JOSHUA)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES LLC, WORMSER CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
July 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MALORY MARIE PASCARELLA on behalf of L'OREAL USA, INC. (PASCARELLA, MALORY)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN ISAAC RUBINSTEIN on behalf of L'OREAL USA, INC. (RUBINSTEIN, BENJAMIN)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by L'OREAL USA, INC. identifying LOral SA as Corporate Parent.. (RYSAVY, CHARLES)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L'OREAL USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9829064) with JURY DEMAND, filed by L'OREAL USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Wormser Corporation, #3 Summons to Process Technologies LLC)(RYSAVY, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L'OREAL USA, INC. v. WORMSER CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORMSER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L'OREAL USA, INC.
Represented By: MALORY MARIE PASCARELLA
Represented By: CHARLES F. RYSAVY
Represented By: BENJAMIN ISAAC RUBINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?