VALDEZ v. EAST COAST EGG FARMERS LLC et al
Plaintiff: PABLO VALDEZ
Defendant: ROMAN RUIZ, RICHARD P. BLAS, MARIBEL BLAS and EAST COAST EGG FARMERS LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv15630
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.(BLANCH, MARIO)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PABLO VALDEZ. ROMAN RUIZ served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (NAYDENSKIY, GENNADIY)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PABLO VALDEZ. EAST COAST EGG FARMERS LLC served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (NAYDENSKIY, GENNADIY)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARIBEL BLAS, RICHARD P. BLAS, EAST COAST EGG FARMERS LLC, ROMAN RUIZ. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sms)
July 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARIBEL BLAS, RICHARD P. BLAS, EAST COAST EGG FARMERS LLC, ROMAN RUIZ ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9829868) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PABLO VALDEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(NAYDENSKIY, GENNADIY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VALDEZ v. EAST COAST EGG FARMERS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROMAN RUIZ
Represented By: MARIO M. BLANCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD P. BLAS
Represented By: MARIO M. BLANCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIBEL BLAS
Represented By: MARIO M. BLANCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAST COAST EGG FARMERS LLC
Represented By: MARIO M. BLANCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PABLO VALDEZ
Represented By: GENNADIY NAYDENSKIY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?