PARK v. CHANG W. LEE, M.D., P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Jinhee Park
Defendant: Hyunok Anne Lee, Chang W. Lee, Chang W. Lee, M.D., P.C. and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 2:2019cv15646
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 12:30 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. The parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 11/29/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/5/2019. (jqb, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(LEE, DIANE)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Hyunok Anne Lee on 7/25/2019, filed by JINHEE PARK. (SHIN, SEUNG HAN)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Chang W. Lee on 7/25/2019, filed by JINHEE PARK. (SHIN, SEUNG HAN)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Chang W. Lee, MD, P.C. on 7/25/2019, filed by JINHEE PARK. (SHIN, SEUNG HAN)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Chang W. Lee, MD, P.C. on 7/25/2019, filed by JINHEE PARK. (SHIN, SEUNG HAN)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE H. LEE on behalf of All Defendants (LEE, DIANE)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHANG W. LEE, M.D., P.C., CHANG W. LEE, HYUNOK ANNE LEE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
July 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9830304) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Jinhee Park. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SHIN, SEUNG HAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARK v. CHANG W. LEE, M.D., P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyunok Anne Lee
Represented By: DIANE H. LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chang W. Lee
Represented By: DIANE H. LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chang W. Lee, M.D., P.C.
Represented By: DIANE H. LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Represented By: DIANE H. LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jinhee Park
Represented By: SEUNG HAN SHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?