DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC v. MJY-GS1, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC
Defendant: MJY-GS1, INC., KYENG LEE and HOON LEE
Case Number: 2:2019cv15659
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #7 Order submitted by HOON LEE, KYENG LEE, MJY-GS1, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/3/2019. (JB, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT ORDER, that Defendants shall serve and file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 10/3/2019. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 9/4/2019. (JB, ) Modified on 9/5/2019 (JB, ).
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Pretrial Order CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (COUCH, BRYAN)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. HOON LEE served on 8/10/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; KYENG LEE served on 8/10/2019, answer due 9/3/2019; MJY-GS1, INC. served on 8/10/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HOON LEE, KYENG LEE, MJY-GS1, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
July 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (jr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH C. MEGARIOTIS on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC (MEGARIOTIS, JOSEPH)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HOON LEE, KYENG LEE, MJY-GS1, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9831636), filed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC v. MJY-GS1, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJY-GS1, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYENG LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOON LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC
Represented By: JOSEPH C. MEGARIOTIS
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?