ASTRAZENECA LP et al v. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, ASTRAZENECA LP and ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. and DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv15739
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney RAVIN R. PATEL terminated. (PATEL, RAVIN)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC. waiver sent on 7/31/2019, answer due 10/29/2019; DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. waiver sent on 7/31/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (FLAHERTY, JOHN)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (qa, )
July 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (mfr)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by RAVIN R. PATEL on behalf of ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED (PATEL, RAVIN)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED identifying AstraZeneca PLC as Corporate Parent.. (FLAHERTY, JOHN)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9837531), filed by ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(FLAHERTY, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASTRAZENECA LP et al v. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASTRAZENECA LP
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?