BOSS, M.D. v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: WILLIAM K. BOSS, M.D.
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv15757
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 11/18/2019. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 9/19/2019. (ld, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Plaintiff. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILLIAM K. BOSS, M.D.. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
July 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9839178), filed by WILLIAM K. BOSS, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOSS, M.D. v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM K. BOSS, M.D.
Represented By: MICHAEL GOTTLIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?