TABORA et al v. LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Plaintiff: EVA PEREZ, LENNY MARTINEZ, BERNIE HMUROVICH, SARAH JOHNSON and REX TABORA
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv15826
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS AND SETTING PLEADING SCHEDULE by BERNIE HMUROVICH, SARAH JOHNSON, LENNY MARTINEZ, EVA PEREZ, REX TABORA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PARK, AMEY)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Shanon J. Carson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PARK, AMEY)
August 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Shanon J. Carson: $ 150, receipt number CAM010645 (byl)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave for the Pro Hac Vice admission of Shanon J. Carson, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/8/2019. (byl) Modified on 8/8/2019 (byl, ).
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE DEUTSCH on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DEUTSCH, LAWRENCE)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JACOB MARC POLAKOFF on behalf of All Plaintiffs (POLAKOFF, JACOB)
July 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shanon J. Carson. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (byl)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shanon J. Carson by BERNIE HMUROVICH, SARAH JOHNSON, LENNY MARTINEZ, EVA PEREZ, REX TABORA. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Amey J. Park, #2 Certification of Shanon J. Carson, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PARK, AMEY)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, )
July 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9844084) with JURY DEMAND, filed by REX TABORA, LENNY MARTINEZ, SARAH JOHNSON, BERNIE HMUROVICH, EVA PEREZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(PARK, AMEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TABORA et al v. LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVA PEREZ
Represented By: AMEY JIYOUNG PARK
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEUTSCH
Represented By: JACOB MARC POLAKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LENNY MARTINEZ
Represented By: AMEY JIYOUNG PARK
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEUTSCH
Represented By: JACOB MARC POLAKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERNIE HMUROVICH
Represented By: AMEY JIYOUNG PARK
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEUTSCH
Represented By: JACOB MARC POLAKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH JOHNSON
Represented By: AMEY JIYOUNG PARK
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEUTSCH
Represented By: JACOB MARC POLAKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REX TABORA
Represented By: AMEY JIYOUNG PARK
Represented By: LAWRENCE DEUTSCH
Represented By: JACOB MARC POLAKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?