HEALY v. PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST. MARY'S PASSAIC
Plaintiff: Janet Healy
Defendant: PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST. MARY'S PASSAIC, JOHN DOES 1-5 AND 6-10 and PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST. MARY'S PASSAIC LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv16093
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that Plaintiff stipulates to a dismissal without prejudice and will proceed with filing the case in JAMS. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/4/2019. (sm)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Plaintiff regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Without Prejudice. (BEARDEN, DRAKE)
August 21, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #6 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Without Prejudice. Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Without Prejudice by PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST. MARY'S PASSAIC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law iso Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Emily DeSmedt Certification and exhibits iso Motion to Compel Arbitration, #3 Proposed Order)(DESMEDT, EMILY)
August 12, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 submitted by PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST. MARY'S PASSAIC LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/20/2019. (sm)
August 10, 2019 Filing 5 Exhibit to #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order by PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST. MARY'S PASSAIC LLC. (DESMEDT, EMILY)
July 31, 2019 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (eu, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (DESMEDT, EMILY)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST. MARY'S PASSAIC. (DESMEDT, EMILY)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST. MARY'S PASSAIC. (DESMEDT, EMILY)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST. MARY'S PASSAIC from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Passaic County, case number PAS-L-001854-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9855718), filed by PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST. MARY'S PASSAIC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(DESMEDT, EMILY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEALY v. PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST. MARY'S PASSAIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Healy
Represented By: KEVIN M. COSTELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST. MARY'S PASSAIC
Represented By: EMILY C. DESMEDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5 AND 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - ST. MARY'S PASSAIC LLC
Represented By: EMILY C. DESMEDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?