PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC. v. PYRAMID FOOD SERVICES CORP. et al
Plaintiff: PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC.
Defendant: PYRAMID FOOD SERVICES CORP., ROSA FERREIRA and LUIS FERREIRA
Case Number: 2:2019cv16398
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Steven C Mannion
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 11/18/2019 12:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/2/2019. (spc, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(PETRIELLO, JOHN)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. PETRIELLO on behalf of All Defendants (PETRIELLO, JOHN)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #10 Request for Default, #9 Request for Default, #8 Request for Default Stipulation to vacate default by All Defendants. (PETRIELLO, JOHN)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Default by PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC. against Rosa Ferreira. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Request for Entry of Default)(BODNER, JONATHAN)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Default by PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC. against Luis Ferreira. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Request for Entry of Default)(BODNER, JONATHAN)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Default by PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC. against Pyramid Food Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Request for Entry of Default)(BODNER, JONATHAN)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC.. (BODNER, JONATHAN)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC.. LUIS FERREIRA served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (BODNER, JONATHAN)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC.. PYRAMID FOOD SERVICES CORP. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (BODNER, JONATHAN)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC.. ROSA FERREIRA served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (BODNER, JONATHAN)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LUIS FERREIRA, ROSA FERREIRA, PYRAMID FOOD SERVICES CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
August 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (ak, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC.. (BODNER, JONATHAN)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9873292), filed by PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(BODNER, JONATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC. v. PYRAMID FOOD SERVICES CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PYRAMID FOOD SERVICES CORP.
Represented By: JOHN J. PETRIELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSA FERREIRA
Represented By: JOHN J. PETRIELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS FERREIRA
Represented By: JOHN J. PETRIELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLAINFIELD FRUIT & PRODUCE CO. INC.
Represented By: JONATHAN S. BODNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?