TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND et al v. ANKA PAINTING COMPANY, INC.
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND and TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND
Defendant: ANKA PAINTING COMPANY, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv16430
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The initial conference scheduled for 10/4/2019 at 11:00 AM is hereby adjourned to 10/7/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The parties shall submit a proposed Joint Discovery Plan as a Word document, to ESK_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Courts form Joint Discovery Plan may be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/10/2019. (as, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Steven J. Bushinsky, Esquire requesting adjournment of Initial Conference re #10 Order, Set Hearings, Set/Clear Flags. (BUSHINSKY, STEVEN)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER: Initial scheduling conference set for 10/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark -Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/6/2019. (as, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by ANKA PAINTING COMPANY, INC..(TOBIA, RONALD)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ANKA PAINTING COMPANY, INC.. (TOBIA, RONALD)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by OTHIAMBA NKOSI LOVELACE on behalf of ANKA PAINTING COMPANY, INC. (LOVELACE, OTHIAMBA)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD L. TOBIA on behalf of ANKA PAINTING COMPANY, INC. (TOBIA, RONALD)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE, TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND. ANKA PAINTING COMPANY, INC. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (FEEHAN, W.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANKA PAINTING COMPANY, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
August 8, 2019 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (eu, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND, PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND, TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE. (FEEHAN, W.)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BUSHINSKY, STEVEN)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANKA PAINTING COMPANY, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9875383), filed by PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE, TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(FEEHAN, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND et al v. ANKA PAINTING COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAINTERS DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 VACATION FUND
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Represented By: W. DANIEL FEEHAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANKA PAINTING COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: OTHIAMBA NKOSI LOVELACE
Represented By: RONALD L. TOBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?