JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al v. MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV and JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED and MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv16484
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting Letter requesting to cancel 2/13/2020 Status Conference. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 2/13/2020. (ams, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 44 AMENDED ORDER setting Telephone Status Conferences. etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 12/16/2019. (dam, )
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER setting Telephone Status Conferences. etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 12/13/2019. (dam, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 42 Discovery Confidentiality Order re #40 Plaintiff's Letter with Proposed DCO. etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 12/11/2019. (dam, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Preston Imperatore in Support of Discovery Confidentiality Order re #40 Letter by MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
December 10, 2019 Filing 40 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to Hon. Mark Falk, U.S.M.J. re Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH)
December 4, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ANDREW D. COHEN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 39 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrew D. Cohen to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10154781.) (MILLER, KEITH)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #36 Plaintiff's Application/Letter for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of ANDREW D. COHEN, ESQ. etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 12/2/2019. (dam, )
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Defendant's Letter requesting a two-week extension of time to 12/10/2019 to submit a DCO. etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 11/26/2019. (dam, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 36 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to Hon. Mark Falk, U.S.M.J. re Proposed Pro Hac Vice Admission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith J. Miller, #2 Declaration of Andrew D. Cohen, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH)
November 25, 2019 Filing 35 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to the Honorable Mark Falk, Chief U.S.M.J. Requesting Extension of Time to File Discovery Confidentiality Order. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
November 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/12/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder NONE.) (LM, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 34 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to Hon. Mark Falk, U.S.M.J. re Proposed Joint Discovery Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH)
November 1, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DEEPRO R. MUKERJEE, LANCE A. SODERSTROM and GUYLAINE HACHE, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 33 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Guylaine Hache, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
November 1, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Lance A. Soderstrom, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
November 1, 2019 Filing 31 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Deepro R. Mukerjee, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
October 28, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fees as to DEEPRO R. MUKERJEE, ESQ.; LANCE A. SODERSTROM, ESQ.; and GUYLAINE HACHE, PH.D., ESQ.: $ 450, receipt number NEW040855 (dam, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to Counterclaim by All Plaintiffs.(MILLER, KEITH)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #13 Defendant's Application/Letter for the Pro Hac Vice admission of DEEPRO R. MUKERJEE, ESQ.; LANCE A. SODERSTROM, ESQ.; and GUYLAINE HACHE, PH.D., ESQ. etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 10/8/2019. (dam, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 28 LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 10/7/19. (LM, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 24, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint , Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. by MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 19, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JAY J. CHO, GREGORY DISKANT, ARON FISCHER, JEFFREY HUGHES, ESQ, MEGHAN LARYWON, BARBARA LYNN MULLIN and A. ROBERT QUIRK, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by ZHIQIANG LIU on behalf of JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (LIU, ZHIQIANG)
September 18, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice A. Robert Quirk, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9973360.) (MILLER, KEITH)
September 18, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Barbara L. Mullin, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9973357.) (MILLER, KEITH)
September 18, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Meghan Larywon, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9973351.) (MILLER, KEITH)
September 18, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey Hughes, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9973349.) (MILLER, KEITH)
September 18, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Aron Fischer, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9973346.) (MILLER, KEITH)
September 18, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Gregory Diskant, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9973344.) (MILLER, KEITH)
September 18, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jay J. Cho, Ph.D., Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9973340.) (MILLER, KEITH)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Plaintiff's Application/Petition for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of BARBARA LYNN MULLIN, ESQ.; GREGORY DISKANT, ESQ.; ARON FISCHER, ESQ.; A. ROBERT QUIRK, ESQ.; MEGHAN LARYWON, ESQ.; JEFFREY HUGHES, ESQ.; and JAY J. CHO, PH.D. etc. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 9/16/2019. (dam, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION/PETITION for pro hac vice admissions for by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith J. Miller, Esq., #2 Declaration of Barbara Lynn Mullin, Esq., #3 Declaration of Gregory Diskant, Esq., #4 Declaration of Aron Fischer, Esq., #5 Declaration of A. Robert Quirk, Esq., #6 Declaration of Meghan Larywon, Esq., #7 Declaration of Jeffrey Hughes, Esq., #8 Declaration of Jay J. Cho, Ph.D., Esq., #9 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by KEITH J. MILLER (MILLER, KEITH)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by ALISSA MARIE PACCHIOLI on behalf of MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED (PACCHIOLI, ALISSA)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. to Chief Magistrate Judge Mark Falk, Regarding Application On Consent for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Deepro R. Mukerjee, Esq., Lance A. Soderstrom, Esq., and Guylaine Hache, Ph.D., Esq. On Behalf of Defendant Mylan Laboratories Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Arnold B. Calmann, Esq., #2 Declaration of Deepro R. Mukerjee, Esq., #3 Declaration of Lance A. Soderstrom, Esq., #4 Declaration Guylaine Hache, Ph.D., Esq., #5 Text of Proposed Order)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 5, 2019 Clerk's Text Order - The document #12 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/24/2019. (dam, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs' Complaint.. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Letter with Text of Proposed Order. Plaintiff hereby dismisses without prejudice their claims against Defendants MYLAN PHARMACETUICALS INC. and MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL LLC. The parties agree that this Action will continue in this District with respect to Plaintiffs' claims against MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED. etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 9/5/2019. (dam, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re Proposed Stipulation and Order Dismissing Without Prejudice Certain Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR on behalf of MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL LLC, MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (ESCANLAR, KATHERINE)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY S. SOOS on behalf of MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL LLC, MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (SOOS, JEFFREY)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD B. CALMANN on behalf of MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL LLC, MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV. MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (MILLER, KEITH)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV. MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (MILLER, KEITH)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV. MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (MILLER, KEITH)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 AO120 Patent Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A) (dam, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL LLC, MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
August 8, 2019 Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk added. (eu, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL LLC, MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9879395), filed by JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MILLER, KEITH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al v. MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV
Represented By: KEITH J. MILLER
Represented By: ZHIQIANG LIU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: KEITH J. MILLER
Represented By: ZHIQIANG LIU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Represented By: JEFFREY S. SOOS
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Represented By: JEFFREY S. SOOS
Represented By: ALISSA MARIE PACCHIOLI
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL LLC
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Represented By: JEFFREY S. SOOS
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?