ONWUAZOR v. TSOUKARIS et al
Petitioner: JEROME OKOYE ONWUAZOR
Respondent: CHARLES GREEN, JOHN TSOUKARIS and DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 2:2019cv16528
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #5 Order submitted by CHARLES GREEN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/10/2019. (JB, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, that Respondents' time to file an answer to the habeas petition filed by Petitioner in the above-captioned matter is extended until 10/10/2019. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 9/27/2019. (JB, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from AUSA Hajdarpasic Regarding Request for Extension of Time. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN terminated. Attorney ENES HAJDARPASIC for CHARLES GREEN added.. (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Respondents DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and JOHN TSOUKARIS are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall serve copies of the Petition and this Order upon the lone remaining respondent, Charles Green by regular mail. The Clerk shall forward a copy of the Petition and this Order to the Civil Division Chief, United States Attorneys Office. Within forty-five (45) days after the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall electronically file an answer to the Petition. Jerome may file and serve a reply within thirty (30) days after the answer is filed. etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/13/2019. (dam, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number NEW040243.), filed by JEROME OKOYE ONWUAZOR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ONWUAZOR v. TSOUKARIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JEROME OKOYE ONWUAZOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHARLES GREEN
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN TSOUKARIS
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?