BOB v. WARDEN OF HUDSON COUNTY DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS AND REHAB et al
Petitioner: NATA S. BOB
Respondent: DHS/ICE and WARDEN OF HUDSON COUNTY DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS AND REHAB
Case Number: 2:2019cv16550
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER; granting #6 Respondents' time to file an answer to the habeas petition filed by Petitioner in the above-captioned matter is extended until October 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/1/2019. (sms)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from AUSA Hajdarpasic Regarding Request for Extension of Time to Answer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
September 17, 2019 (Clerk's Note: Since Petitioner's address has been changed, a copy of the Court's Memorandum and Order has been resent to Petitioner at the current address). (sms)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address; Filed by NATA S. BOB. (sms)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN terminated. Attorney ENES HAJDARPASIC for DHS/ICE,ENES HAJDARPASIC for WARDEN OF HUDSON COUNTY DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS AND REHAB added.. (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Nata Bob regarding bond request. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sms)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Memorandum and ORDER TO ANSWER. Within forty-five (45) days of the entry of this memorandum and order, respondents shall file and serve an answer that (1) responds to the allegations and grounds in the petition and (2) includes all affirmative defenses respondents seek to invoke; respondents shall file and serve with the answer certified copies of all documents necessary to resolve petitioners claim(s) and affirmative defenses, etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/15/2019. (byl)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by NATA S. BOB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Application IFP, #3 Envelope)(qa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOB v. WARDEN OF HUDSON COUNTY DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS AND REHAB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DHS/ICE
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN OF HUDSON COUNTY DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS AND REHAB
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATA S. BOB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?