RABEN V. QUEST DIAGNOSTICS, INC.,

Plaintiff: JENNIFER RABEN
Defendant: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION and QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv16603
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Member Case Transferred in on 8/13/19 from the District of Colorado 1:19-cv-01889 for MDL 2904 AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION (gh, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
August 13, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (gh, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:19-cv-01889. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 19-cv-01889 KMT, to the District of New Jersey, to become part of MDL 2904 by Clerk on 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter regarding Transfer) (evana, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion to Stay by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/16/2019.(jgonz, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Robertson, Eric)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Consolidation and Transfer by JPML by Defendant Quest Diagnostics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Robertson, Eric)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric Lindsay Robertson on behalf of Quest Diagnostics, Inc.Attorney Eric Lindsay Robertson added to party Quest Diagnostics, Inc.(pty:dft) (Robertson, Eric)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Galen Driscoll Bellamy on behalf of Quest Diagnostics, Inc.Attorney Galen Driscoll Bellamy added to party Quest Diagnostics, Inc.(pty:dft) (Bellamy, Galen)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Raben. Quest Diagnostics, Inc. served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Beale, Alexander)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ivy Tran Ngo on behalf of Jennifer RabenAttorney Ivy Tran Ngo added to party Jennifer Raben(pty:pla) (Ngo, Ivy)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/26/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 8/19/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/19/2019, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/2/2019. (jgonz, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was drawn in error. This case has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01889-KMT. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX090907. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (rroge, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Quest Diagnostics, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Alexander F. Beale added to party Jennifer Raben(pty:pla), filed by Jennifer Raben. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Beale, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RABEN V. QUEST DIAGNOSTICS, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER RABEN
Represented By: Alexander F. Beale
Represented By: Ivy Tran Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INC
Represented By: Eric Lindsay Robertson
Represented By: Galen Driscoll Bellamy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?