ZICCARELLO v. SANYO ENERGY (U.S.A.) CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: Richard Ziccarello
Defendant: PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation and SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv16623
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, STEVEN T. KNUPPEL and DAVID M. BIRKA, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ams)
September 24, 2019 Filing 54 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David M. Birka-White to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
September 24, 2019 Filing 53 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Steven T. Knuppel to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
September 24, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Steven T. Knuppel and David M. Birka-White: $ 300, receipt number TRE106060 (abr)
September 18, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JOHN D. GREEN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ams)
September 18, 2019 Filing 52 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John D. Green to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
September 18, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DAVID SINGH, H DAVID LESLIE and AUDREY STANO, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ams)
September 17, 2019 Filing 51 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Audrey Stano to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9969984.) (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 17, 2019 Filing 50 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice H. David Leslie to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9969981.) (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 17, 2019 Filing 49 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David R. Singh to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9969980.) (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David R. Singh, H. David Leslie and Audrey Stano; shall each make annual payments to the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection and submit a payment of $150 to the Clerk of the Court for the District of New Jersey, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/13/2019. (sm)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven T. Knuppel; shall make payments to the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection and make a payment of $150 to the Clerk, United States District Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/13/2019. (sm)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David M. Birka-White; shall make payments to the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection and make a payment of $150 payable to the Clerk, United States District Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/13/2019. (sm)
September 12, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID L. YOHAI on behalf of PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, SANYO ENERGY (U.S.A.) CORPORATION, SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION (YOHAI, DAVID)
September 12, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David Singh, H. David Leslie, and Audrey Stano. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David Singh, H. David Leslie, and Audrey Stano by PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, SANYO ENERGY (U.S.A.) CORPORATION, SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard H. Epstein, #2 Declaration of David R. Singh, #3 Declaration of H. David Leslie, #4 Declaration of Audrey Stano, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to John E. Green: $ 150, receipt number TRE105787 (abr)
September 9, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Charles E. Schaffer: $ 150, receipt number TRE105742 (abr)
September 9, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motions set for 10/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John D. Green. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/6/2019. (vm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven T. Knuppel by RICHARD ZICCARELLO. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael M. Weinkowitz, #2 Certification of Steven T. Knuppel, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
September 6, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David M. Birka-White by RICHARD ZICCARELLO. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael M. Weinkowitz, #2 Certification of David M. Birka-White, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
September 6, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #40 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John D. Green. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John D. Green by RICHARD ZICCARELLO. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael M. Weinkowitz, #2 Certification of John D. Green, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles E. Schaffer; shall make payments to the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection and pay $150 to the Clerk, United States District Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/4/2019. (sm)
September 3, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles E. Schaffer. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
August 28, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles E. Schaffer by RICHARD ZICCARELLO. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael M. Weinkowitz, #2 Certification Charles E. Schaffer, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
August 27, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA ELLEN SEDLAK on behalf of PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, SANYO ENERGY (U.S.A.) CORPORATION, SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION (SEDLAK, LAURA)
August 27, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD H. EPSTEIN on behalf of PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, SANYO ENERGY (U.S.A.) CORPORATION, SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
August 26, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL M. WEINKOWITZ on behalf of RICHARD ZICCARELLO (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
August 14, 2019 Filing 34 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (jr)
August 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
August 13, 2019 Filing 33 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-01995. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 12, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the District of New Jersey. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #31 Stipulation To Transfer Case. Case transferred to District of New Jersey.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Transfer Case; [Proposed] Order Granting Transfer filed by Richard Ziccarello. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE: Motion Hearing re #21 MOTION to Strike or Stay MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction set for 9/12/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Opposition due by 8/13/2019. Reply due by 8/27/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Singh, David) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Plaintiff's ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #26 Stipulation Scheduling Order as Amended Regarding Plaintiff Filing an Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike, Stay, or Dismiss and Defendants' Reply Thereto. Motion hearing currently scheduled for 8/29/2019 and cmc currently scheduled for 8/1/2019 are continued pending a ruling on the Dickerts Motion and shall be reset at an appropriate time. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2019) Modified on 7/10/2019 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated [Proposed] Scheduling Order Regarding Plaintiff Filing Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike, Stay or Dismiss and Defendants' Reply Thereto filed by Richard Ziccarello. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by David Ramraj Singh Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney John A. Stratford (Singh, David) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
June 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Strike or Stay MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 7/10/2019. Replies due by 8/15/2019. Motion Hearing reset for 8/29/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #23 Stipulation Regarding Extension of Deadlines re: #21 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's opposition due 7/10/2019; defendants' reply due 8/15/2019; hearing set 8/29/2019 at 1:30 p.m.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE filed by Richard Ziccarello. (Taylor, Russell) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 22 Declaration in Support of #21 MOTION to Strike or Stay, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #21 ) (Singh, David) (Filed on 5/30/2019) Modified on 5/31/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Strike or Stay, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike, Stay, or Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 6/13/2019. Replies due by 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Singh, David) (Filed on 5/30/2019) Modified on 5/31/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of David L. Yohai ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13369769.) filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Yohai, David) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/16/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Judge Jon S. Tigar no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RELATED CASE ORDER. Case related to 18-cv-4664-EMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/15/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 2:00 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 05/09/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation.. (Singh, David) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/22/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 DEFENDANTS' DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(A) and Civil Local Rule 3-15 by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Panasonic Corporation, Corporate Parent Panasonic Holding (Netherlands) B.V. for Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Singh, David) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation and Richard Ziccarello. (Singh, David) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Richard Ziccarello (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 5/3/2019) Modified on 5/3/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard Ziccarello.. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard Ziccarello (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/29/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13258531.). Filed by Richard Ziccarello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Birka-White, David) (Filed on 4/12/2019) Modified on 4/15/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZICCARELLO v. SANYO ENERGY (U.S.A.) CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: LAURA ELLEN SEDLAK
Represented By: DAVID L. YOHAI
Represented By: RICHARD H. EPSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation
Represented By: LAURA ELLEN SEDLAK
Represented By: DAVID L. YOHAI
Represented By: RICHARD H. EPSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANYO NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: LAURA ELLEN SEDLAK
Represented By: DAVID L. YOHAI
Represented By: RICHARD H. EPSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ziccarello
Represented By: MICHAEL M. WEINKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?