GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. BELVERIO, D.C. et al
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO., GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO. and GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: DANIEL ROIG, P.T., PREMIER HEALTHCARE CENTER, LLC, JEFFREY MASSARONE, D.C., RALPH ROBERT BONOCORE, ANGELA MINHAS, D.C., WINDY TUBALADO, P.T., OLAKUNLE AKINKUNLE, P.T., HARSHA PATEL, D.C. and FRANK BELVERIO, D.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv16664
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. JEFFREY MASSARONE, D.C. served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER by FRANK BELVERIO, D.C., JEFFREY MASSARONE, D.C., PREMIER HEALTHCARE CENTER, LLC. (RANDOLPH, JEFFREY)
September 16, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to STEVEN T. HENESY: $ 150, receipt number NEW040529 (dam, )
September 16, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to MAX GERSHENOFF: $ 150, receipt number NEW040528 (dam, )
September 16, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to BARRY I. LEVY: $ 150, receipt number NEW040527 (dam, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. OLAKUNLE AKINKUNLE, P.T. served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019; FRANK BELVERIO, D.C. served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019; HARSHA PATEL, D.C. served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019; PREMIER HEALTHCARE CENTER, LLC served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019; DANIEL ROIG, P.T. served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019; WINDY TUBALADO, P.T. served on 8/24/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed on Frank Belverio, D.C., #2 Summons Returned Executed on Harsha Patel, D.C., #3 Summons Returned Executed on Premier Healthcare Center, L.L.C., #4 Summons Returned Executed on Daniel Roig, P.T., #5 Summons Returned Executed on Windy Tubalado, P.T., #6 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to BARRY I. LEVY, MAX GERSHENOFF and STEVEN T. HENESY. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/4/2019. (dam, )
August 26, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Barry I. Levy, Max Gershenoff and Steven T. Henesy. Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Barry I. Levy, Max Gershenoff and Steven T. Henesy by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Certification of Gene Y. Kang in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certification of Barry I. Levy in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certification of Max Gershenoff in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #5 Certification of Steven T. Henesy in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to OLAKUNLE AKINKUNLE, P.T., FRANK BELVERIO, D.C., RALPH ROBERT BONOCORE, JEFFREY MASSARONE, D.C., ANGELA MINHAS, D.C., HARSHA PATEL, D.C., PREMIER HEALTHCARE CENTER, LLC, DANIEL ROIG, P.T., WINDY TUBALADO, P.T. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, )
August 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (ROBERTELLI, JOHN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OLAKUNLE AKINKUNLE, P.T., FRANK BELVERIO, D.C., RALPH ROBERT BONOCORE, JEFFREY MASSARONE, D.C., ANGELA MINHAS, D.C., HARSHA PATEL, D.C., PREMIER HEALTHCARE CENTER, LLC, DANIEL ROIG, P.T., WINDY TUBALADO, P.T. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9892125) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ROBERTELLI, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. BELVERIO, D.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: JOHN J. ROBERTELLI
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO INDEMNITY CO.
Represented By: JOHN J. ROBERTELLI
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO CASUALTY CO.
Represented By: JOHN J. ROBERTELLI
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN J. ROBERTELLI
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL ROIG, P.T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIER HEALTHCARE CENTER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY MASSARONE, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RALPH ROBERT BONOCORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA MINHAS, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINDY TUBALADO, P.T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLAKUNLE AKINKUNLE, P.T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARSHA PATEL, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK BELVERIO, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?