MEGAFORCE RECORDS, INC. v. MCMURTRIE et al
Plaintiff: MEGAFORCE RECORDS, INC.
Defendant: TIMOTHY MCMURTRIE and KENNETH BALLONE
Case Number: 2:2019cv16683
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Edward S Kiel
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Timothy McMurtrie dated 10/9/2019. (sm)
September 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Reconsideration . Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration by MEGAFORCE RECORDS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ISRAEL, RONALD)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that this Federal Action is Stayed and Administratively Terminated w/o prejudice, with leave to the parties to move to lift the stay upon the completion of the proceedings brought before the TTAB, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 8/29/2019. (th, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to KENNETH BALLONE, TIMOTHY MCMURTRIE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (qa, )
August 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEGAFORCE RECORDS, INC. identifying Megaforce Records, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (ISRAEL, RONALD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ABIGAIL JEAN REMORE on behalf of MEGAFORCE RECORDS, INC. (REMORE, ABIGAIL)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KENNETH BALLONE, TIMOTHY MCMURTRIE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9893561) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MEGAFORCE RECORDS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ISRAEL, RONALD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEGAFORCE RECORDS, INC. v. MCMURTRIE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY MCMURTRIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH BALLONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGAFORCE RECORDS, INC.
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Represented By: ABIGAIL JEAN REMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?