WOODS v. QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INC., et al

Plaintiff: MARK WOODS
Defendant: American Medial Collection Agency, OPTUM360 LLC, QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED, RETRIEVAL-MASTERS CREDITOR and DOES 1 to 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv16689
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 24 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-05817. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 13, 2019 Filing 23 Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2904, transferring case to USDC, District of New Jersey and assigned to Honorable Madeline C. Arleo. Case transferred electronically. (iv)
August 7, 2019 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) filed by Defendant Optum360 LLC. (Akerman, Alexander)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING RULING ON CONSOLIDATION AND TRANSFER BY JPML #17 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court hereby GRANTS the Parties' Stipulation and ORDERS as follows: All proceedings and deadlines in this action are stayed in their entirety until seven (7) days after the JPML issues a ruling as to whether this action should be consolidated and transferred into a MDL proceeding in In re American Medical Collection Agency, Inc., Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL Docket No. 2904. The Parties are directed to file a status report notifying the Court of the JPML's decision within seven (7) days of the JPML's ruling. IT IS SO ORDERED.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Optum360 LLC, identifying Optum360 LLC, Optum Rocket, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., OptumInsight Holdings, LLC, Optum, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Akerman, Alexander)
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Optum360 LLC identifying Optum Rocket, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., OptumInsight Holdings, LLC, Optum, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated as Corporate Parent. (Akerman, Alexander)
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Petition to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation [Local Rule 83-1.4.3] filed by Defendant Optum360 LLC. (Akerman, Alexander)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Ruling on Consolidation and Transfer by JPML filed by Defendant Optum360 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation for Stay of Proceedings Pending Ruling on Consolidation and Transfer by JPML)(Akerman, Alexander)
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexander Akerman counsel for Defendant Optum360 LLC. Adding Alexander Akerman as counsel of record for Defendant Optum360 LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Optum360 LLC. (Attorney Alexander Akerman added to party Optum360 LLC(pty:dft))(Akerman, Alexander)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-05817 FMO(SKx). (rn)
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Quest Diagnostics Incorporated. (esa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Optum360 LLC. (esa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Optum360 LLC. (esa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant American Medial Collection Agency. (esa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff MARK WOODS. (Coelho, Thiago)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff MARK WOODS. (Coelho, Thiago)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff MARK WOODS. (Coelho, Thiago)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MARK WOODS, (Coelho, Thiago)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MARK WOODS. (Coelho, Thiago)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff MARK WOODS. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Coelho, Thiago)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24038023 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff MARK WOODS. (Attorney Thiago Merlini Coelho added to party MARK WOODS(pty:pla))(Coelho, Thiago)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOODS v. QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medial Collection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM360 LLC
Represented By: Alexander Akerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RETRIEVAL-MASTERS CREDITOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK WOODS
Represented By: Thiago Merlini Coelho
Represented By: Robert James Dart
Represented By: Justin F Marquez
Represented By: Patty W Chen
Represented By: Babak Bobby Saadian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?