36MEDIA LLC v. AT YOUR GATE LLC
Plaintiff: 36media LLC
Defendant: AT YOUR GATE LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv16697
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; that the time for Defendant AT YOU GATE, LLC to respond to the Complaint, which would otherwise be due on September 30, 2019, is hereby extended until October 14, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/1/2019. (ld, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #6 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by AT YOUR GATE LLC. (KIERNAN, MICHAEL)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; that the time is hereby extended until September 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/13/2019. (ld, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by AT YOUR GATE LLC. (KIERNAN, MICHAEL)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL WILLIAM KIERNAN on behalf of AT YOUR GATE LLC (KIERNAN, MICHAEL)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 36MEDIA LLC. AT YOUR GATE LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (BEYER, JEFFREY)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AT YOUR GATE LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
August 16, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, Parties must be entered in upper case. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ld, )
August 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by 36MEDIA LLC as to AT YOUR GATE LLC. (BEYER, JEFFREY).
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT YOUR GATE LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9894532), filed by 36MEDIA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BEYER, JEFFREY).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 36MEDIA LLC v. AT YOUR GATE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 36media LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY MATTHEW BEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT YOUR GATE LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL WILLIAM KIERNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?