Allende et al v. Laboratory Corporation of America et al

Plaintiff: Gina Allende and Morgan Ottmann
Defendant: OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC., LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS, LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA and QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED
In Re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv16703
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Member Case Transferred in on 8/15/19 from the Southern District of New York 1:19-cv-05989 for MDL 2904 AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION (gh, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, )
August 15, 2019 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (gh, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-05989. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 15, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (sjo)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/9/2019) (sjo)
June 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Juan Eneas Monteverde. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
June 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Juan Eneas Monteverde. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Gina Allende, Morgan Ottmann. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
June 27, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Nelson Stephen Roman as possibly related to 19CV5210. (pne)
June 27, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 27, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 7:19-cv-05210. Document filed by Gina Allende, Morgan Ottmann.(Monteverde, Juan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Monteverde, Juan)
June 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Juan Eneas Monteverde to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): name of the Judge for the related case was omitted from the PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
June 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Juan Eneas Monteverde, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Monteverde, Juan) Modified on 6/27/2019 (pne).
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Laboratory Corporation of America, Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings, Optum360 Services, Inc., Quest Diagnostics Incorporated. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17147100)Document filed by Gina Allende, Morgan Ottmann.(Monteverde, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allende et al v. Laboratory Corporation of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA HOLDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Allende
Represented By: Juan Eneas Monteverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Ottmann
Represented By: Juan Eneas Monteverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?